FL H0939 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to entities & persons authorized to compensate or direct compensation to intercollegiate athlete; prohibits intercollegiate athlete from entering into compensation contract that conflicts with certain contracts; prohibits certain parties from using postsecondary educational institution's mark without written consent of such institution or its designee.
Title
Intercollegiate Athlete Compensation and Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1428 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/939 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/939/BillText/Filed/PDF |