FL H0981 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2015-127)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2015-127)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Florida Pharmacy Act does not prohibit the dispensing of compounded drug in practice of veterinary medicine.
Title
Practice of Pharmacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2015-127) |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1180 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2015-127)
H1049 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-127
H1049 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-127
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 9201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/981 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0981/BillText/Filed/PDF |