FL H0985 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that notice of public meeting include description of each matter to be considered at such meeting; prohibits board or commission of agency or authority of state, county, municipality, or political subdivision from acting upon matter at public meeting which was not included in notice of such meeting; provides exception for certain emergency matters upon approval of super majority of members of board or commission; provides applicability.
Title
Public Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0718 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/985 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0985/BillText/Filed/PDF |