FL H1007 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-178, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-178, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring every insurer to designate at least one primary anti-fraud employee for certain purposes; requiring insurers to adopt an anti-fraud plan; requiring the Division of Investigative and Forensic Services of the department to create, by a specified date, a report detailing best practices for the detection, investigation, prevention, and reporting of insurance fraud and other fraudulent insurance acts, etc.
Title
Prohibited Insurance Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#458 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#389 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#389 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-178, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179) | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-05 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-05 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | House | Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (533134, 564446, 888862) 1259 |
2017-05-05 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-05 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (888862) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (888862) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1012 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-05-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-05-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 1047 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (333963, 588753) |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/24/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-04-20 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-04-18 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-17 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/17/17, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-27 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1009 (Related) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-179, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
S1012 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178), CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)
S1014 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179), CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
H1205 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
H1299 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/CS/CS/HB 1007
S1316 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
S1600 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
S1012 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178), CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)
S1014 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179), CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
H1205 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
H1299 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/CS/CS/HB 1007
S1316 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
S1600 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9896 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9924 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 99245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 99275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 99287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 99289 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 99291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 99292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 744 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |