FL H1037 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain property owners who have not filed personal property tax returns to qualify for tax exemption under specified conditions.
Title
Tangible Personal Property Tax Returns
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1210 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1037 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1037/BillText/Filed/PDF |