FL S1210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that owners of assessed property, rather than previously assessed property, qualify for certain exemptions without filing an initial return under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Personal Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1037 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1210 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1210/BillText/Filed/HTML |