FL H1039 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes for-hire vehicles from list of vehicles that are not considered transportation network carriers or are not exempt from certain registration; provides insurance maintained by TNC vehicle owners may satisfy required insurance coverages; authorizes TNC drivers to contract with companies to install TNC digital advertising devices on TNC vehicles; provides immunity from certain liability for TNC drivers, TNC vehicle owners, owners & operators of TNC digital advertising devices, & certain TNCs; authorizes entities to elect to be regulated as luxury ground TNCs by notifying DFS; provides for preemption over local law on governance of luxury ground TNCs, luxury ground TNC drivers, & luxury ground TNC vehicles; provides that TNCs are not liable for certain harm to persons or property if certain conditions are met.
Title
Transportation Network Companies
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee | Rep. Bob Rommel [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#615 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#615 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Chapter No. 2020-87 | |
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1352 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (276525) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-01 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1352 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1039
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security