FL H1065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides levels of care at certified recovery residences & their respective levels of care for residents; defines "community housing"; authorizes DCF to issue license for service components operated by service provider; requires certified recovery residences to remove individuals from their positions under certain circumstances; prohibits certified recovery residences from denying individual access to housing under specified circumstances.
Title
Substance Abuse Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#738 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#738 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Chapter No. 2024-176 | |
2024-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-25 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-02-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-02-29 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1180 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-02-13 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-12 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-30 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-30 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1180 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1065
H1583 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
S1636 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
H1583 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
S1636 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |