FL H1085 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises surplus requirements for insurers when applying for or renewing a certificate of authority & for HMOs at all times; revises term "life & health insurer" to include specified HMOs & prepaid limited health service organizations; revises reporting requirements for certain insurers; revises reporting requirements of certain insurers; provides that HMOs are insurers for certain purposes; revises OIR examination authority; repeals provisions relating to payment of dividends & distributions of other property by HMOs; provides directive to DOLRI.
Title
Insurer Solvency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1190 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
H0635 (Similar To) 2015-02-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0635 (Similar To) 2015-02-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
624 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 4085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1085 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1085/BillText/Filed/PDF |