FL H1257 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that person complete specified periods of licensure before being eligible for ownership of or other pecuniary interest in bail bond agency; revises eligibility requirements for bail bond agent applicants; provides requirements for primary bail bond agents; revises restrictions on where & how bail bond agents & agencies may solicit business; provides for fine & license suspension for violations of specified licensing provisions & for fine & license revocation for second offense; provides requirements for relicensure; clarifies provisions relating to commitment of bail bond agent; provides circumstances under which, while on bond, a breach of bail bond conditions occurs; revises conditions under which forfeiture must be discharged; revises provisions relating to remission of forfeiture.
Title
Bail Bonds
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1150 (Same As) 2015-04-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
648 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1257 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1257/BillText/Filed/PDF |