FL H1269 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises entities responsible for screening, employing, & terminating child protection team medical directors; revises terms; revises subdivision of state from districts to circuits for purpose of child protection teams; revises required board certifications for certain entities; revises timeframe in which child protection team medical directors must obtain certification; requires Children's Medical Services to convene task force to develop protocol for forensic interviewing of children suspected of having been abused; revises provisions regarding expert testimony provided by certain entities.
Title
Child Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#154 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#154 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Chapter No. 2017-153 | |
2017-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1318 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-27 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-23 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1454 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/SB 1318 (Laid on Table in Senate)
S1318 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1269 (Ch. 2017-153)
S1318 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1269 (Ch. 2017-153)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 3031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
827 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |