FL H1293 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions for Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund including, retention multiple, adjusted retention multiple, reimbursement contracts, loss adjustment expense; contract obligations; reimbursements, & reimbursement premium formula; authorizes eligible Reinsurance to Assist Policyholders program insurers to purchase RAP coverage under program; revises reimbursement under RAP program; removes provision prohibiting premiums from being charged for participation in program; revises coverage layers of Florida Optional Reinsurance Assistance program; requires transfer of specified amount from FORA Fund into Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund.
Title
Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund and Reinsurance Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Hillary Cassel [D] | Rep. Alex Andrade [R] | Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Vicki Lopez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1668 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 5551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 5552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1293 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1293/BillText/Filed/PDF |