FL H1343 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines term "dealer" for purposes of sales & use tax, to include certain persons who do not have place of business in this state & sell into this state certain personal property, products, or services.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1184 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1343 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1343/BillText/Filed/PDF |