FL H1343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies duty of DEP to adopt, in coordination with water management districts, rules; directs water management districts, with DEP oversight, to adopt rules for specified design & performance standards relating to new development & redevelopment projects; directs DEP to incorporate such rules by reference for use within each water management district & amend such rules into applicant's handbook; provides rebuttable presumption that certain systems do not cause or contribute to violations of applicable state water quality standards; revises permitting requirements for construction of certain stormwater management systems.
Title
Stormwater Management Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1344 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 4131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1343 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1343/BillText/Filed/PDF |