FL H1343 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH & DEP to submit reports & recommendations relating to transfer of Onsite Sewage Program in DOH to DEP; transfers Onsite Sewage Program from DOH to DEP; requires WMDs to submit consolidated annual reports to OEDR; removes provisions relating to DOH technical review & advisory panel & research & review advisory committee; requires DEP to conduct bottled water study; prohibits approval of certain consumptive use permits; authorizes nutrient reducing OSTDS; creates OSTDS technical advisory committee; requires basin management action plans to include plans & cooperative elements; requires DEP to submit cost estimates to OEDR; provides priority funding for utility projects; provides for biosolids management & water quality monitoring; revises administrative penalties; prohibits legal rights for environment.
Title
Environmental Resource Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-25 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/11/20, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H405 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S686 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S1382 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
H1091 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-158
H1199 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1450 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1091
S1758 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S686 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S1382 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
H1091 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-158
H1199 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1450 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1091
S1758 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
153 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
180 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00652 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 08601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 1835 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 1838 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |