FL S1758 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a type two transfer of the Administration Commission to the Division of Administrative Hearings, the Florida Commission on Human Relations, and the Department of Economic Opportunity; providing for a type two transfer of the Florida Land and Water Adjudicatory Commission to the Department of Environmental Protection, the Department of Economic Opportunity, and the Division of Administrative Hearings; requiring the head of the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to be a secretary appointed by, and serving at the pleasure of, the Governor and confirmed by the Senate, etc.
Title
Executive Branch
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations; Rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5201 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S2506 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-113
H1343 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
S2506 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-113
H1343 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 2035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
195 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
207 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
336 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 243 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 2295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 4111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1758 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1758/BillText/Filed/HTML |