FL H1359 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain employers to provide specified unpaid leave to employee performing Civil Air Patrol mission or engaged in Civil Air Patrol training; prohibits specified public & private employers from discharging, reprimanding, or penalizing member of Florida Wing of CAP because of absence by reason of CAP service or training; provides procedures for & requirements of employees & employers with respect to taking CAP leave & employment following such leave; specifies rights & entitlements of member of CAP who returns to work after completion of CAP mission or training; provides for civil action for violation of act; specifies damages; provides for attorney fees & costs.
Title
Civil Air Patrol, Florida Wing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 134 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1359 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1359/BillText/Filed/PDF |