FL H1359 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires political committees dissolve & dispose of funds in specified manner; revises maximum contribution amount person or political committee may make to candidate for legislative office; prohibits Governor, Lieutenant Governor, member of Cabinet, or member of Legislature from soliciting or accepting contributions during certain periods on behalf of certain persons; requires political committee that is dissolved to dispose of funds by certain means & file report.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1359 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1359/BillText/Filed/PDF |