FL H1399 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires applicant for vacation rental license to provide Division of Hotels & Restaurants of DBPR with certain information; revises penalties for operator who fails, neglects, or refuses to obtain license or pay required license fee.
Title
Public Lodging and Public Food Service Establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1422 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1399 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1399/BillText/Filed/PDF |