FL H1537 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises rulemaking authority of Department of Lottery; authorizes department to adopt rules governing operation of games offered by department; authorizes department to adopt emergency rules for purpose of implementing instant ticket games & online games; removes authority of department to perform any functions of DMS under any of chs. 255, 273, 281, 283, & 287, F.S., etc.
Title
Administrative Procedures/Dept. of the Lottery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House Roll Call No. 0813 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-20 | In Messages | |
2010-04-20 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00768; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00769; CS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 00769 | |
2010-04-19 | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading -HJ 00735 | |
2010-04-15 | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading -HJ 00687 | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00667; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00667 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00478; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00478 | |
2010-03-30 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/01/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00358 | |
2010-03-19 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-22 | CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -HJ 00357 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00359 | |
2010-03-15 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/17/10, 9:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00257 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00140 | |
2010-03-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1844 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932; Amendment(s) adopted (912852, 295630, 180196) -SJ 00932; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1565 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00933; Laid on Table -SJ 00933
H1565 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H1565 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0024 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0024 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |