FL H1545 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Chapter No. 2024-74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Chapter No. 2024-74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the offense of harmful communication to a minor; ranking the offense on the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code; etc.
Title
Child Exploitation Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#976 (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#768 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#768 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Chapter No. 2024-74 | |
2024-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 100, NAYS 11 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment 285882 Concur |
2024-03-07 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (285882) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1656 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1656 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1545
H1129 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
S1196 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1129 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
S1196 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
847 | 01385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |