FL H6017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate Marcus Button for harms & losses he sustained as result of negligence of an employee of Pasco County School Board; provides appropriation to repay Mark Button, now deceased, & Robin Button, as surviving parent & natural guardian of Marcus Button, for harms & losses they sustained as result of injury to their child, Marcus Button; provides limitation on payment of compensation & attorney fees.
Title
Relief/Marcus Button/Pasco County School Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S18 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
127 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
192 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
587 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |