FL H7061 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Florida Election Campaign Financing Act; deletes provisions governing public funding of campaigns for candidates for statewide office who agree to certain expenditure limits.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7059 (Related) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
S1116 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-116, companion bill(s) passed, see SJR 1114 (Passed)
S1114 (Similar To) 2024-04-12 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
S1116 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-116, companion bill(s) passed, see SJR 1114 (Passed)
S1114 (Similar To) 2024-04-12 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |