FL H7087 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends repeal dates for exemptions from public record requirements for personal identifying & location information of petitioner requesting notification of service of injunction for protection against domestic violence, repeat violence, sexual violence, & dating violence & other court actions related to injunction held by clerks & law enforcement agencies.
Title
OGSR/Protective Injunctions for Certain Types of Violence
Sponsors
House Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee | Sen. Tracie Davis [D] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#86 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#86 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Chapter No. 2017-65 | |
2017-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7028 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/29/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7028 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. 2017-65)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |