FL S0042 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Ramiro Companioni by the City of Tampa; providing for an appropriation to compensate Mr. Companioni for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the City of Tampa; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Ramiro Companioni by the City of Tampa
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3533 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/42 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0042/BillText/Filed/HTML |