FL S0064 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on The Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on The Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates Charles Pandrea, husband of Janet Pandrea, for the death of Janet Pandrea as a result of the negligence of the North Broward Hospital District. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM: $608,555.
Title
Relief/Charles Pandrea/No. Broward Hospital Dist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on The Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 00017 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2009-07-31 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0779 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)