FL S0092 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00687; Substituted HB 1 -SJ 00687; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1 (Ch. 2010-45) -SJ 00687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00687; Substituted HB 1 -SJ 00687; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1 (Ch. 2010-45) -SJ 00687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the statute of limitations for wrongful death actions for intentional torts resulting in death from acts described in specified provisions relating to murder or manslaughter. Provides for application.
Title
Statutes of Limitations/Wrongful Death Actions [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Crist [R] | Sen. Nan Rich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00687; Substituted HB 1 -SJ 00687; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1 (Ch. 2010-45) -SJ 00687 | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 16 NAYS 4 -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/15/10, 2:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-10 | Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00017; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 37-S; Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Now in Judiciary -SJ 00163 | |
2010-01-19 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0; Now in Judiciary | |
2010-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0001 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-45