FL S0104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits knowing sexual conduct or sexual contact with an animal. Prohibits specified related activities. Provides that the act does not apply to certain husbandry, conformation judging, and veterinary practices, etc.
Title
Sexual Activities Involving Animals [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Nan Rich [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0032 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00833; Read 3rd time -SJ 00833; Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 -SJ 00833 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-29 | Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00349 | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00349 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 110-S | |
2010-03-18 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/17/10, 3:15 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Agriculture; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00018; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 37-S; Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Agriculture -SJ 00162 | |
2010-01-19 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0; Now in Agriculture | |
2010-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Agriculture; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1611 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC)
S0382 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H1445 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0382 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H1445 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)