FL S0210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current or former public guardians and the spouses and children thereof; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Public Guardians
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/21/17, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 21031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |