FL S0210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health to impose initial application and biennial renewal fees for the licensing of medical marijuana retail facilities, etc.
Title
State Taxes or Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Finance and Tax; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S212 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H797 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H797 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/210 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/210/BillText/Filed/HTML |