FL S0226 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that civil suits to establish support for dependent adult children may be filed only in a certain court by specified individuals; requiring such support to be paid to the dependent adult child or other specified persons; specifying that a child support order does not terminate on the child's 18th birthday in certain circumstances; requiring the court to consider certain factors when determining the amount of support for a dependent adult child; providing an additional circumstance under which a guardian advocate must be represented by an attorney in guardianship proceedings, etc.
Title
Support for Dependent Adult Children
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#450 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Chapter No. 2023-213 | |
2023-06-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2023-05-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023) |
2023-05-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | In Messages |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (581458) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/30/23 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/22/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H813 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 226 (Ch. 2023-213)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |