FL S0304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, in considering whether to voluntarily admit a person, the determination as to whether the medical and behavioral conditions of the person are within the safe management capabilities of the service provider shall be made exclusively by the service provider; providing that, with regard to involuntary admissions, specified determinations shall be made at the exclusive discretion of the service provider; clarifying that a specified assessment is required only if the individual is admitted; specifying that after involuntary assessment, the decision as to the disposition of the individual shall be made at the discretion of the qualified professional, etc.
Title
Substance Abuse Treatment, Assessment, and Stabilization
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] | Sen. Greg Evers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
397 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/304 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0304/BillText/Filed/HTML |