FL S0312 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons who apply for licensure renewal as a dentist or dental hygienist to furnish certain information to the Department of Health in a dental workforce survey. Requires the department to serve as the coordinating body for the purpose of collecting, disseminating, and updating dental workforce data. Requires the department to maintain a database regarding the state's dental workforce. Authorizes certain business entities to pay for prescription drugs obtained by practitioners licensed under ch. 466, F.S., etc.
Title
Practice of Dentistry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-06 | In Messages | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 363 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 04/06/11 | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-24 | Now in Budget -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/23/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 32 | |
2011-01-28 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 118 | |
2011-01-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-01-25 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 118 | |
2011-01-14 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/25/11, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Health Regulation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 32 | |
2010-12-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0483 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0314 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0485 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0795 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0656 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0314 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0485 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0795 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0656 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |