FL S0312 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the model rule establishing family support personnel policies to provide for a specified amount of leave for an employee who has a family member with a serious health condition, etc.
Title
Family Support Personnel Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0595 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/312 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0312/BillText/Filed/HTML |