FL S0418 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Criminal Diversion Racial and Ethnic Impact Data Collection Act"; Requiring each law enforcement agency to report to the Department of Law Enforcement the number of persons arrested and released without being charged and the race and ethnicity of those persons; requiring each state attorney to report to the department the number of persons against whom formal charges were brought and subsequently dismissed and the race and ethnicity of those persons; requiring each clerk of the circuit court to report to the department the number of persons admitted into programs for diversion from prosecution and the race and ethnicity of those persons, etc.
Title
Criminal Justice Data Collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/418 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/418/BillText/Filed/HTML |