FL S0418 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2021-19)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2021-19)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an exemption from public records requirements for the addresses and telephone numbers of persons provided public emergency shelter during a storm or catastrophic event and held by the agency that provided the emergency shelter; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Persons Provided Public Emergency Shelter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2021-19) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 327 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/21, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/16/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H327 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-19