FL S0428 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the categories of persons who may prescribe brand name drugs under the prescription drug program when medically necessary; exempting controlled substances prescribed by an advanced registered nurse practitioner or a physician assistant from the disqualifications for certification or licensure, and for continued certification or licensure, as a deputy pilot or state pilot; applying existing penalties for violations relating to the prescribing or dispensing of controlled substances by an advanced registered nurse practitioner, etc.
Title
Health Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Senate | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113) |
2015-10-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0210 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0586 (Similar To) 2016-03-25 - Chapter No. 2016-113
H0423 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-224, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145)
S0676 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
H0471 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
H0977 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-231, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
S1250 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231)
S0586 (Similar To) 2016-03-25 - Chapter No. 2016-113
H0423 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-224, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145)
S0676 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
H0471 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
H0977 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-231, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
S1250 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 12315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 02751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/428 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0428/BillText/Filed/HTML |