FL S0460 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Substituting the Arc of Florida for the Association for Retarded Citizens for purposes of certain proceedings relating to children; substituting the term "intellectual disability" for the term "mental retardation"; clarifying in s. 393.063, F.S., that the meaning of the terms "intellectual disability" or "intellectually disabled" is the same as the meaning of the terms "mental retardation," "retarded," and "mentally retarded" for purposes of matters relating to the criminal laws and court rules; revising definitions relating to intermediate care facilities for the developmentally disabled to delete unused terms, etc.
Title
Intellectual Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-02-23 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-02-23 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 674 | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Budget -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/22/12, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-13 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time -SJ 501 | |
2012-02-13 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-10 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-09 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 42 | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 42 | |
2011-10-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
650 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
86 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
914 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
914 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 3012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
918 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
941 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
984 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |