FL S0460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying a new fee for recording a claim of lien under the Construction Lien Law; providing that recording a claim of lien after a specified time is an act of fraud; requiring certain documents to be provided before a claim of lien is recorded; requiring the clerk of court to attach such document to the claim of lien before recording the claim, etc.
Title
Construction Liens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/460 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0460/BillText/Filed/HTML |