FL S0464 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain fiscally constrained counties from local match requirements for specified grants; encouraging communities to apply for specified grants to establish misdemeanor mental health jail diversion programs; authorizing the court to refer a misdemeanor defendant charged with a misdemeanor crime for certain evaluation or assessment if a party or the court raises a concern regarding the misdemeanor defendant's competency to proceed due to a mental disorder, etc.
Title
Certain Defendants With Mental Illness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H293 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 658 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |