FL S0484 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2014-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2014-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an alternative surcharge for use of a motor vehicle pursuant to an agreement with a car-sharing service for less than a specified number of consecutive hours; defining the term "car-sharing service", etc.
Title
Rental Car Surcharge
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Oscar Braynon [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2014-199) |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 343 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/14 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/09/14, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/10/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0343 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-199