FL S0550 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting an extension of the current moratorium on drilling in the Gulf of Mexico east of the Military Mission Line, etc.
Title
Gulf of Mexico Range Complex
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/16/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H319 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - Adopted