FL S0550 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the unlawful employment practices in the Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992 to include discriminatory practices relating to military status, etc.
Title
Unlawful Employment Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H853 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/550 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/550/BillText/Filed/HTML |