FL S0768 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 309 (Ch. 2015-109)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 309 (Ch. 2015-109)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a licensed facility to document observation services in a patient's discharge papers when the facility places the patient on observation status; requiring a licensed facility to notify a patient or patient's proxy of observation status through discharge papers; authorizing a licensed facility to notify a patient or patient's proxy of observation status through other forms of communication, etc.
Title
Patient Observation Status Notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 309 (Ch. 2015-109) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 309 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/15 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0309 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-109
S0820 (Similar To) 2015-03-18 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 309 (Ch. 2015-109)
S0820 (Similar To) 2015-03-18 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 309 (Ch. 2015-109)