FL S0898 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 803 (Ch. 2014-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 803 (Ch. 2014-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "information services" to include certain data processing and other services, etc.
Title
Communications Services Tax
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Senate Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities Committee | Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] |
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 803 (Ch. 2014-36) |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 803 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/14 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/02/14, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time 226 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/04/14, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0803 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-36