FL S0898 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring members of certain authorities to comply with certain financial disclosure requirements; requiring the Department of Transportation to approve design plans for all transportation projects relating to department-owned rights-of-way under certain circumstances; limiting the toll rate for high-occupancy toll lanes or express lanes in certain counties; creating the Greater Miami Expressway Agency; creating the Florida Sunshine Rebate Program, etc.
Title
Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 385 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S928 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1044 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H905 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-153, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
H6059 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S928 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1044 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H905 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-153, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
H6059 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 0316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 0317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 0318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 00115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9950 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9958 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9959 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 0305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |