FL S0912 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain notices to include an agency website address for a specified purpose; requiring the Department of State to include on the Florida Administrative Register website the agency website addresses where statements of estimated regulatory costs can be viewed in their entirety, etc.
Title
Agency Rulemaking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H83 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/912 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/912/BillText/Filed/HTML |