FL S1124 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the mandatory 3-day waiting period to apply only to handguns, rather than to firearms; removing a provision authorizing that the mandatory waiting period expire upon completion of a records check; revising records requirements relating to firearm sales to apply only to handguns, etc.
Title
Mandatory Waiting Period for Handgun Purchases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy; Rules |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H17 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1124 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1124/BillText/Filed/HTML |