FL S1170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Gaming
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Gaming
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a harness racing permitholder that is applying for a slot machine license to file with the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering a written agreement between the applicant and the Florida Standardbred Breeders and Owners Association which governs certain purses and awards; requiring sums for awards to be remitted monthly, etc.
Title
Slot Machine Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Gaming |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Gaming; Regulated Industries; Appropriations |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1033 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on Gaming
H1383 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H1383 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1170 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1170/BillText/Filed/HTML |