FL S1228 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the annual gross sales limitation for exempting cottage food operations from certain food and building permitting requirements, etc.
Title
Cottage Food Operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0765 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1228 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1228/BillText/Filed/HTML |